Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio de Mendonça Monteiro

Deceased

Bishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1907Born
4 Apr 193123.4Ordained PriestPriest of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
31 Jan 195042.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
31 Jan 195042.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina
16 Apr 195042.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina
7 Mar 195749.3AppointedBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
23 Dec 197265.1DiedBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio de Mendonça Monteiro
Bishop Antônio de Mendonça Monteiro (born , died ) Bishop of Bonfim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCachoeira

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast