Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ranulfo da Silva Farias

Deceased

Archbishop of Maceió, Alagoas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1887BornNazaré
3 Apr 191022.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 192032.6AppointedBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Sep 192033.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Aug 193951.9AppointedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
19 Oct 196376.1DiedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ranulfo da Silva Farias:
Archbishop Ranulfo da Silva Farias (born , died ) Archbishop of Maceió

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013