Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Benito Condurú Pacheco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Parnaíba, Piaui

Titular Bishop of Decoriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1892BornSão Bento
21 Nov 191523.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 194148.8AppointedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
6 Jul 194149.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
7 Feb 194653.6AppointedBishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
17 Jan 195966.5ResignedBishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
17 Jan 195966.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Decoriana
1 Oct 197280.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Felipe Benito Condurú Pacheco:
Bishop Felipe Benito Condurú Pacheco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Parnaíba

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014