Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gonzalez Alonso

Bishop Emeritus of Cajazeiras, Paraiba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1940 BornSobradillo, Spain
29 Jun 196423.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 199454.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil
7 Dec 199454.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Baliana
18 Mar 199554.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baliana
20 Jun 200160.9AppointedBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
16 Sep 201575.1RetiredBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Gonzalez Alonso
Bishop José Gonzalez Alonso (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cajazeiras

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cajazeiras.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,535
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Aug 2016