Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ronaldo Ribeiro

Bishop Emeritus of Formosa, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1957 Born
5 May 198528.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
6 Jun 200750.2AppointedBishop of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Jul 200750.4Ordained BishopBishop of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Aug 200750.4InstalledBishop of Janaúba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Sep 201457.5AppointedBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
22 Nov 201457.7InstalledBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
12 Sep 201861.5ResignedBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Ronaldo Ribeiro
Bishop José Ronaldo Ribeiro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Formosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUberaba
Ordained BishopGinásio de Esporte Carmem de Oliveira, Sobradinho

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Formosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2007
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,484
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2014
  • i: CB, 12 Nov 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 12 Sep 2018

Quantcast