Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dilmo Franco de Campos

Auxiliary Bishop of Anápolis, Goias, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Ita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1972 Born
10 Jan 199825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
27 Nov 201947.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Anápolis, Goias, Brazil
27 Nov 201947.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ita
25 Jan 202047.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ita

MicroData Summary for Dilmo Franco de Campos
Bishop Dilmo Franco de Campos (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Anápolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFormosa, Diocese of Formosa, Goias
Ordained BishopCathedral, Formosa, Diocese of Formosa, Goias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Anápolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2019
  • ob: CB, 27 Nov 2019
  • c2+: CB, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast