Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adair José Guimarães

Bishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1960 Born
21 Dec 198626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
27 Feb 200847.6AppointedBishop of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil
17 May 200847.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil
27 Feb 201958.6AppointedBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
1 Jun 201958.9InstalledBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adair José Guimarães
Bishop Adair José Guimarães (born ) Bishop of Formosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMara Rosa, Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias
Ordained BishopSão José, Seminary, Uruaçu, Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Formosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,744
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2019
  • i: CB, 8 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 Jun 2019

Quantcast