Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José da Silva Chaves

Bishop Emeritus of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1930 BornSão Domingos
8 Dec 195525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
29 Nov 196737.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
29 Nov 196737.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusubbicari
11 Feb 196837.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusubbicari
14 May 197646.0AppointedBishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
3 Jan 200776.6RetiredBishop of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José da Silva Chaves:
Bishop José da Silva Chaves (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Uruaçu (Uruassu)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013