Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco Agamenilton Damascena

Bishop-Elect of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1975 Born
16 Sep 200025.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
19 Mar 200125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
19 Feb 201943.6AppointedAdministrator of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
12 Sep 202045.2CeasedAdministrator of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
23 Sep 202045.2AppointedBishop of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil
6 Dec 202045.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil
19 Dec 202045.4InstalledBishop of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Agamenilton Damascena
Father Francisco Agamenilton Damascena (born ) Bishop-Elect of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCurrais Novos, Diocese of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte
Ordained DeaconCathedral, Caicó, Diocese of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte
Ordained PriestNiquelândia
Ordained BishopUruaçu, Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Rubiataba-Mozarlândia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Sep 2020
  • od/c01: CB, 23 Sep 2020
  • ob/i: CB, 5 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 7 Oct 2020

Quantcast