Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Gomes dos Santos

Deceased

Archbishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1910Born
1 Nov 193222.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jan 194332.7AppointedBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
4 Apr 194333.0Ordained BishopBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
1 Feb 194938.8AppointedBishop of Aracajú, Brazil
7 Mar 195746.9AppointedArchbishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil
1 Jun 198575.1DiedArchbishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando Gomes dos Santos
Archbishop Fernando Gomes dos Santos (born , died ) Archbishop of Goiânia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePatos

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017