Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Rodrigues do Rêgo

Bishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1966 Born
13 Dec 199225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias, Brazil
15 May 201952.3AppointedBishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
4 Aug 201952.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
24 Aug 201952.6InstalledBishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Rodrigues do Rêgo
Bishop José Francisco Rodrigues do Rêgo (born ) Bishop of Ipameri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarras
Ordained PriestUruaçu, Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias
Ordained BishopCourtyard, São José, Seminary, Uruaçu, Diocese of Uruaçu (Uruassu), Goias

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ipameri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2019
  • c1: CB, 15 May 2019
  • ob: CB, 26 May 2019
  • i: CB, 2 Jun 2019
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jun 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,219

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast