Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Pinheiro da Silva, S.D.B.

Bishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1959 Born
13 Jan 198525.9ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Jan 199131.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Mar 200546.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
2 Mar 200546.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gisipa
6 May 200546.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gisipa
22 Apr 201556.2AppointedBishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Pinheiro da Silva
Bishop Eduardo Pinheiro da Silva S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Jaboticabal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLins

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jaboticabal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,881
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018