Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio Carlos Altieri, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1951 Born
31 Jan 197119.2ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Jul 197422.7Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Dec 197827.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Jul 200654.7AppointedBishop of Caraguatatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Oct 200655.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caraguatatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 Nov 200655.0InstalledBishop of Caraguatatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Jul 201260.7AppointedArchbishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
15 Jul 201563.7ResignedArchbishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Carlos Altieri
Archbishop Antônio Carlos Altieri S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Passo Fundo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Passo Fundo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2006
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,277
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018