Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Mason, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1945 Born
3 Apr 197126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
3 Mar 199954.1AppointedBishop of Caraguatatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 May 199954.2Ordained BishopBishop of Caraguatatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 May 200560.3AppointedBishop of Piracicaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando Mason
Bishop Fernando Mason O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Piracicaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoreggia, Diocese of Treviso, Italy
Ordained BishopCentro Esportivo Municipal Ubaldo Gonçalves, Caraguatatuba, Diocese of Caraguatatuba, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Piracicaba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,507

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 12 Aug 2019

Quantcast