Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vilson Dias de Oliveira, D.C.

Bishop Emeritus of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1958 Born
2 Feb 197819.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of Christian Doctrine
22 Apr 198425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Christian Doctrine
13 Jun 200748.5AppointedBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 Sep 200748.7Ordained BishopBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Sep 200748.8InstalledBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 May 201960.4ResignedBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vilson Dias de Oliveira
Bishop Vilson Dias de Oliveira D.C. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Limeira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuaíra
Ordained BishopSão Sebastião, Church, Guaíra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limeira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2007
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,495
  • r: Bollettino, 17 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 17 May 2019

Quantcast