Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís d’Andrea, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caxias do Maranhão, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1934BornAlbano
4 Oct 195218.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
19 Dec 195925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
29 Oct 198753.7AppointedBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
6 Jan 198853.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
19 Mar 201076.1RetiredBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
8 Sep 201278.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Caxias do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luís d’Andrea:
Bishop Luís d’Andrea O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caxias do Maranhão

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,424
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Jul 2014