Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alcivan Tadeus Gomes de Araújo

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Paraíba, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Fata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1972 Born
1 Feb 199724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
8 Nov 202351.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraíba, Brazil
8 Nov 202351.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Fata
2 Feb 202451.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fata

MicroData Summary for Alcivan Tadeus Gomes de Araújo
Father Alcivan Tadeus Gomes de Araújo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Paraíba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerro Corá, Diocese of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte
Ordained BishopSantana, Cathedral, Caicó, Diocese of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Paraíba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2023
  • ob: CB, 11 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 11 Nov 2023