Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel León Prado

Deceased

Bishop of Linares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1854BornSantiago
22 Sep 187722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
12 Jun 191358.5AppointedVicar General of Talca, Chile
14 Dec 192571.0AppointedBishop of Linares, Chile
27 Dec 192571.0Ordained BishopBishop of Linares, Chile
25 Apr 192671.3InstalledBishop of Linares, Chile
3 Mar 193479.2DiedBishop of Linares, Chile

MicroData Summary for Miguel León Prado:
Bishop Miguel León Prado (born , died ) Bishop of Linares

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 64
  • c5: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013