Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Rucker Sotomayor

Deceased

Bishop of Chillán, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1867Born
20 Dec 189023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
1906²38.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
1910²42.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
13 Mar 192356.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mariamme
25 Jul 192356.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mariamme
14 Dec 192558.8AppointedBishop of Chillán, Chile
25 Apr 192659.2InstalledBishop of Chillán, Chile
6 Jan 193567.9DiedBishop of Chillán, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín Rucker Sotomayor (VIAF: 224780049)
Bishop Martín Rucker Sotomayor (born , died ) Bishop of Chillán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceChillán, Diocese of Chillán

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 41
  • i: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017