Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfredo Cifuentes Gómez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of La Serena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1890BornSantiago de Chile
19 Oct 191323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
23 Dec 193343.8AppointedBishop of Antofagasta, Chile
15 Apr 193444.1Ordained BishopBishop of Antofagasta, Chile
21 May 193444.2InstalledBishop of Antofagasta, Chile
5 Jun 194353.3AppointedArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
3 Jul 194353.4InstalledArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
19 Mar 194757.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Copiapó, Chile
17 Jun 194858.3ResignedApostolic Administrator of Copiapó, Chile
10 Mar 196777.0RetiredArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
10 Mar 196777.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thapsus
2 Dec 197080.8ResignedTitular Archbishop of Thapsus
13 Oct 198999.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Cifuentes Gómez:
Archbishop Alfredo Cifuentes Gómez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Serena

  • a priest for 75.9 years
  • a bishop for 55.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015