Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arturo Mery Beckdorf

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valdivia

Titular Archbishop of Phasis

Archbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1903BornTalcahuano
28 Oct 192623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Concepción, Chile
22 Mar 194137.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antofagasta, Chile
22 Mar 194137.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Parnassus
11 May 194137.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parnassus
8 Jun 194339.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Antofagasta, Chile
29 Jul 194440.8AppointedBishop of Valdivia, Chile
12 Sep 194440.9InstalledBishop of Valdivia, Chile
20 Apr 195551.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santiago de Chile
20 Apr 195551.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Phasis
14 May 196157.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Santiago de Chile
27 Apr 196359.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of La Serena, Chile
1967²63.2ResignedCoadjutor Archbishop of La Serena, Chile
28 May 197672.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Valdivia, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arturo Mery Beckdorf:
Archbishop Arturo Mery Beckdorf (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valdivia

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015