Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Salas Valdés, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arica, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1917Born
29 Mar 193518.0EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
20 Dec 194730.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Oct 196346.5AppointedPrelate of Arica, Chile
7 Dec 196346.7InstalledPrelate of Arica, Chile
5 Dec 196649.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gor
11 Mar 196749.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gor
17 Nov 197760.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Gor
29 Aug 198669.4AppointedBishop of Arica, Chile
15 May 199376.1RetiredBishop of Arica, Chile
17 Feb 199981.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Arica, Chile

MicroData Summary for Ramón Salas Valdés
Bishop Ramón Salas Valdés S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017