Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Renato Hasche Sánchez, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arica, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1927Born
1 Feb 194719.2EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
19 Jun 196032.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 May 199365.5AppointedBishop of Arica, Chile
29 Jun 199365.6Ordained BishopBishop of Arica, Chile
24 Apr 200375.4DiedBishop of Arica, Chile

MicroData Summary for Renato Hasche Sánchez (VIAF: 129783511)
Bishop Renato Hasche Sánchez S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Arica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago
Ordained PriestWoodstock, MD
Death PlaceSan Antonio

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,116
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • opl: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017