Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patricio Infante Alfonso

Archbishop Emeritus of Antofagasta, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1929 Born
28 Jun 195323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
7 Aug 198454.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
7 Aug 198454.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gergis
23 Sep 198454.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gergis
12 Dec 199061.1AppointedArchbishop of Antofagasta, Chile
25 Jan 199161.2InstalledArchbishop of Antofagasta, Chile
26 Nov 200475.1RetiredArchbishop of Antofagasta, Chile

MicroData Summary for Patricio Infante Alfonso
Archbishop Patricio Infante Alfonso (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Antofagasta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopPontifical Seminary, Chapel, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Antofagasta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1/i: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017