Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastiano Nicotra

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1855BornSan Alfio di Giarre, Italy
21 Dec 187823.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 191661.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
18 Dec 191661.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Chile
31 Dec 191661.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
6 Jan 191761.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
1 Oct 191863.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
30 Nov 191863.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
30 Nov 191863.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Luxembourg
30 May 192367.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
16 May 192872.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
21 May 192973.7DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Nicotra:
Archbishop Sebastiano Nicotra (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Portugal

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013