Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Aguilera Bravo, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Carlos de Ancud


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1884BornEsmeralda de Colina
1 Nov 190824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Dec 191632.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Magallanes-Islas Malvinas, Chile
22 Dec 191632.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Issus
20 May 191733.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Issus
5 Jul 191733.4InstalledVicar Apostolic of Magallanes-Islas Malvinas, Chile
26 Oct 192440.7AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
26 Apr 192541.2InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
30 Apr 193349.2DiedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile

MicroData Summary for Abraham Aguilera Bravo:
Bishop Abraham Aguilera Bravo S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of San Carlos de Ancud

  • a priest for 24.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013