Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Gimpert Paut

Deceased

Bishop of Valparaíso, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1867Born
24 Jun 188922.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
10 Mar 190638.9AppointedEcclesiastical Governor (Vicar General) of Valparaíso, Chile
27 Apr 191649.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
28 Oct 191649.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Echinus
14 Dec 192558.7AppointedBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
30 Apr 192659.1InstalledBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
29 Aug 193770.4DiedBishop of Valparaíso, Chile

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Gimpert Paut
Bishop Eduardo Gimpert Paut (born , died ) Bishop of Valparaíso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstitución

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,916, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast