Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florencio Eduardo Fontecilla Sánchez

Deceased

Bishop of La Serena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1854BornSantiago
11 Jun 187723.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
22 Sep 187723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
26 Jun 189036.3AppointedBishop of La Serena, Chile
8 Sep 189036.5Ordained BishopBishop of La Serena, Chile
3 Mar 190955.0DiedBishop of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for Florencio Eduardo Fontecilla Sánchez:
Bishop Florencio Eduardo Fontecilla Sánchez (born , died ) Bishop of La Serena

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 514

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013