Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Agustín de la Sierra Mercado

Deceased

Bishop of La Serena, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1777Born
19 Mar 180224.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
20 Mar 180224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
22 Jul 184265.2AppointedBishop of La Serena, Chile
9 Jul 184366.1Ordained BishopBishop of La Serena, Chile
31 Aug 185174.3DiedBishop of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for José Agustín de la Sierra Mercado
Bishop José Agustín de la Sierra Mercado (born , died ) Bishop of La Serena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCopiapó

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 37
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017