Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Marán

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1729BornArequipa, Peru
176535.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cuzco, Peru
1 Mar 177949.4AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
21 Nov 177950.1Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
24 May 178050.6InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
12 Sep 179464.9AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
16 Mar 179565.4InstalledBishop of Santiago de Chile
10 Feb 180777.3DiedBishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Marán:
Bishop Francisco José Marán (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 177
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013