Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Jerónimo de Romaní y Carrillo

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1675BornGuamanga
13 Mar 175882.7AppointedBishop of Panamá
1759¹83.5Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
26 Sep 176388.2AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
15 Sep 176893.2DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Jerónimo de Romaní y Carrillo:
Bishop Juan Manuel Jerónimo de Romaní y Carrillo (born , died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 190, and Page 326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015