Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Morcillo Rubio de Suñón de Robledo, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1642BornVillarrobledo, Spain
21 Nov 170159.9SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
15 Mar 170260.2ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
1703²61.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
14 May 170866.4AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
21 Mar 171472.2AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
12 May 172381.4AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
18 Dec 172382.0InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
12 Mar 173088.2DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Morcillo Rubio de Suñón de Robledo:
Archbishop Diego Morcillo Rubio de Suñón de Robledo O.SS.T. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 22, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013