Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Necolalde

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664¹Born
1688¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
1 Apr 171551.2AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
1716²52.0Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
Jan 1717³53.0InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
12 May 172359.3AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
14 May 172460.3DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Necolalde
Archbishop Juan de Necolalde (born 1664, died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Plata
Ordained BishopCharacas, Archdiocese of La Plata o Charcas
Death PlaceArica

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 167, and Page 317
  • opd/i: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast