Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Manrique de Lara

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1683BornLima, Peru
21 Jul 174965.6AppointedBishop of Panamá
9 Jan 175066.1SelectedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
23 Feb 175066.2ConfirmedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
Oct 1750³66.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
31 Jan 176379.2DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Manrique de Lara:
Bishop Felipe Manrique de Lara (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 230, and Page 326
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015