Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás de Roa y Alarcón

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1738BornQuilpolemu
1760²21.6Ordained PriestPriest of Concepción, Chile
12 Sep 179456.3AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
18 Oct 179557.4Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
5 Sep 180567.3DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás de Roa y Alarcón
Bishop Tomás de Roa y Alarcón (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 177
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Feb 2016