Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Hilarión de Etura y Cevallos (Ceballos), O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1774Born
3 Mar 179116.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Dec 183965.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
23 Dec 183965.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
1844¹69.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
23 Jun 184974.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Hilarión de Etura y Cevallos (Ceballos)
Bishop José Hilarión de Etura y Cevallos (Ceballos) O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 95
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 45
  • prof: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Apr 2019

Quantcast