Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph (François-de-Paul) Baudichon, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia

Titular Bishop of Basilinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1812BornSainte-Maure-de-Touraine, France
1837¹24.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
1838¹25.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
13 Aug 184431.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Oceania, Pacific (Oceania)
13 Aug 184431.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
21 Dec 184533.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
9 May 184835.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
17 Jan 185542.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
11 Jun 188269.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph (François-de-Paul) Baudichon
Bishop Joseph (François-de-Paul) Baudichon SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Marquesas Islands {Isole Marchesi}

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Dec 2016