Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Rafael Molina Cortez

Deceased

Titular Bishop-Elect of Sinopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1822Born
20 Mar 184724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
13 Nov 188462.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
8 Apr 188966.4DiedTitular Bishop-Elect of Sinopoli

MicroData Summary for Rafael Molina Cortez
Father Rafael Molina Cortez (born , died ) Titular Bishop-Elect of Sinopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChianquiague
Ordained PriestSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 42.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 520
  • b: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017