Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Blaitt Mariño

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1831Born
8 Mar 185624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Concepción, Chile
17 Dec 188655.5AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
10 Apr 188755.8Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
1 May 188755.9InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
14 Jul 188756.1DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

MicroData Summary for Fernando Blaitt Mariño
Bishop Fernando Blaitt Mariño (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopBon Pasteur, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceConcepción, Diocese of Concepción

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 14
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Jul 2020

Quantcast