Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rafael Valentín Valdivieso y Zañartu

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1804BornSantiago
20 Jul 183429.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
27 Jul 183429.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
4 Oct 184742.9AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
1 Jul 184843.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
8 Jun 187873.6DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Rafael Valentín Valdivieso y Zañartu:
Archbishop Rafael Valentín Valdivieso y Zañartu (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013