Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florentin-Etienne Jaussen, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia

Titular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1815BornRocles, France
184024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
9 May 184833.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
9 May 184833.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)
27 Aug 184833.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Axieri (Azieri)
12 Feb 188468.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
9 Sep 189176.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Florentin-Etienne Jaussen:
Bishop Florentin-Etienne Jaussen SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013