Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco de Paula Solar Mery, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1816Born
27 Jul 183216.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
2 Mar 184023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
19 Mar 185740.6AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
20 Sep 185741.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
18 Feb 185841.6InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
21 Apr 188265.7DiedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco de Paula Solar Mery (VIAF: 101476148)
Bishop Juan Francisco de Paula Solar Mery O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of San Carlos de Ancud

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan José de Maipo, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Merced, Santiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 183
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017