Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Solar Vicuña

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of La Serena

Titular Bishop of Selge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1861BornLa Serena
21 Mar 188524.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Serena, Chile
8 Sep 191453.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Serena, Chile
8 Sep 191453.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Selge
9 Dec 191453.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selge
19 Mar 192059.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Solar Vicuña:
Bishop Eduardo Solar Vicuña (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of La Serena

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013