Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melquisedec del Canto Terán

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Felipe

Titular Bishop of Adrasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1866BornRequinoa
20 Dec 189024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
14 Dec 192559.0AppointedBishop of San Felipe, Chile
27 Dec 192559.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Felipe, Chile
9 May 192659.4InstalledBishop of San Felipe, Chile
18 Mar 193871.3ResignedBishop of San Felipe, Chile
18 Mar 193871.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrasus
15 Jun 194073.5DiedBishop Emeritus of San Felipe, Chile

MicroData Summary for Melquisedec del Canto Terán:
Bishop Melquisedec del Canto Terán (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Felipe

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 63
  • c5: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013