Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prudencio Contardo Ibarra, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Temuco

Titular Bishop of Cabasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1860BornMolina
22 Dec 188323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
4 Jun 190645.6ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Jun 192059.6AppointedVicar General of Temuco, Chile
15 Jun 192059.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Syene
21 Oct 192060.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Syene
14 Dec 192565.1AppointedBishop of Temuco, Chile
3 May 192665.5InstalledBishop of Temuco, Chile
15 Dec 193474.1ResignedBishop of Temuco, Chile
15 Dec 193474.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabasa
17 Mar 195089.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Temuco, Chile

MicroData Summary for Prudencio Contardo Ibarra:
Bishop Prudencio Contardo Ibarra C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Temuco

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013