Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Subercaseaux Errázuriz

Deceased

Archbishop of La Serena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1896BornSantiago
3 Apr 192023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
23 Feb 193538.5AppointedBishop of Linares, Chile
28 Apr 193538.7Ordained BishopBishop of Linares, Chile
12 May 193538.7InstalledBishop of Linares, Chile
8 Jan 194043.4AppointedArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
9 Apr 194043.6InstalledArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
9 Aug 194246.0DiedArchbishop of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for Juan Subercaseaux Errázuriz:
Archbishop Juan Subercaseaux Errázuriz (born , died ) Archbishop of La Serena

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013