Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Antonio Larraín Cotapos

Deceased

Bishop of Chillán, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1887Born
3 Apr 191527.8Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
20 Mar 193749.7AppointedBishop of Chillán, Chile
25 Apr 193749.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chillán, Chile
17 May 193749.9InstalledBishop of Chillán, Chile
10 Aug 195568.1DiedBishop of Chillán, Chile

MicroData Summary for Jorge Antonio Larraín Cotapos
Bishop Jorge Antonio Larraín Cotapos (born , died ) Bishop of Chillán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestSt John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 27
  • opl: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017