Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Moreira Martínez

Deceased

Bishop of Linares, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1896Born
18 Sep 192024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
22 Mar 194144.9AppointedBishop of Linares, Chile
11 Jun 194145.2Ordained BishopBishop of Linares, Chile
15 Jun 194145.2InstalledBishop of Linares, Chile
2 Feb 195861.8DiedBishop of Linares, Chile

MicroData Summary for Roberto Moreira Martínez
Bishop Roberto Moreira Martínez (born , died ) Bishop of Linares

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Bernardo

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018