Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Aguilera Narbona

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Iquique

Titular Bishop of Tambeae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1910BornSalamanca
17 Dec 193222.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Serena, Chile
15 Sep 194131.1AppointedBishop of Iquique, Chile
4 Jan 194231.4Ordained BishopBishop of Iquique, Chile
24 Jan 194231.4InstalledBishop of Iquique, Chile
21 Nov 196656.2ResignedBishop of Iquique, Chile
21 Nov 196656.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tambeae
23 Jan 196857.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Iquique, Chile

MicroData Summary for Pedro Aguilera Narbona:
Bishop Pedro Aguilera Narbona (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Iquique

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013