Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfredo Silva Santiago

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1894BornSantiago de Chile
2 Jun 191722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
23 Feb 193540.5AppointedBishop of Temuco, Chile
28 Apr 193540.6Ordained BishopBishop of Temuco, Chile
1 Jun 193540.7InstalledBishop of Temuco, Chile
4 Feb 193944.4AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
22 Mar 193944.5InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
20 May 193944.7AppointedArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
27 Apr 196368.6ResignedArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
27 Apr 196368.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
4 Dec 197076.2ResignedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
17 Mar 197580.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Silva Santiago:
Archbishop Alfredo Silva Santiago (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013